RI H8255 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 30 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits the town of Middletown from annually increasing its tax levy, more than 2% of the total levied by the town, for its prior fiscal year, without the occurrence of one or more of 5 conditions and an affirmative vote of the majority of its electors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Middletown Tax Levy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-14HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-06-08HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/14/2018)
2018-05-30HouseIntroduced, referred to House Municipal Government

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback