RI H8201 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Town of Jamestown to issue not more than $1,000,000 bonds and notes to finance various improvements at the town of Jamestown's library and related equipment.
Title
Authorizing The Town Of Jamestown To Finance Library Renovations, Repairs And/or Expansion And Related Equipment By The Issuance Of Not More Than $1,000,000 Bonds And Notes Therefor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2018-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/19/2018) |
2018-06-14 | House | House read and passed |
2018-06-08 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/14/2018) |
2018-06-07 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-06-02 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2018) |
2018-05-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2018) |
2018-05-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |