RI H8166 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Applies to settlement of St. Joseph Hospital Retirement Plan settlements/joint tortfeasors' releases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Hospital Conversions Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26HouseSigned by Governor
2018-06-21HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-20SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2018-06-20SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/20/2018)
2018-06-19HouseHouse read and passed
2018-06-16HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/19/2018)
2018-06-13HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-06-08HouseScheduled for consideration (06/13/2018)
2018-05-16HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2018)
2018-05-04HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback