RI H7855 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Provides procedures relative to contractor/subcontractor retainage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contractors' Registration And Licensing Board

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-22 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseSigned by Governor
2018-07-02HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23SenateSenate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence
2018-06-23SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-22HouseHouse passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2018-06-21HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/22/2018)
2018-06-21HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-21HouseScheduled for reconsideration (06/21/2018)
2018-06-21HouseHouse voted to recommit to House Corporations
2018-06-20HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/21/2018)
2018-06-20HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-20HouseScheduled for consideration (06/20/2018)
2018-04-10HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-06HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2018)
2018-04-02HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (04/03/2018)
2018-03-30HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-02-28HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback