RI H7681 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the section of the law authorizing the impoundment of at large animals in private ways in Newport.
Title
Animals At Large
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2018) |
2018-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7681.pdf |