RI H7205 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - Meeting postponed (06/07/2018)
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - Meeting postponed (06/07/2018)
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the town of Coventry from charging its sewage works' users more than the interest the town has actually paid for its borrowed funds for sewage works' purposes.
Title
Relating To Coventry Sewer Authority
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Jared Nunes [D] | Rep. Robert Nardolillo [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] |
Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | House | Meeting postponed (06/07/2018) |
2018-06-01 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2018-04-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2018) |
2018-04-12 | House | Committee transferred to House Municipal Government |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7205.pdf |