RI H7134 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the public utilities commission to implement a purchase of receivables program where the electric distribution company purchases the receivables of a nonregulated power producer at a discount rate.
Title
Electric Generation Service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - Passage (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - Passage (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-06-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-19 | House | House passed Sub A |
2018-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2018) |
2018-06-12 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-06-08 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/12/2018) |
2018-02-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/06/2018) |
2018-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |