PA SR385 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on October 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-24 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on October 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-24 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution directing the Joint State Government Commission to conduct a study to analyze and identify which environmental laws and regulations of this Commonwealth have more stringent standards than Federal law requires.
Title
Directing the Joint State Government Commission to conduct a study to analyze and identify which environmental laws and regulations of this Commonwealth have more stringent standards than Federal law requires.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SR 385 PN 2092, MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-27 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-27 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-24 | Senate | Transmitted as directed |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Adopted (27-21) |
2016-09-27 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |