PA SR382 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-03 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-03 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution urging the Federal Food and Drug Administration to enforce existing guidelines establishing a clear standard of identity for milk.
Title
Urging the Federal Food and Drug Administration to enforce existing guidelines establishing a clear standard of identity for milk.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-03 | Senate | Transmitted as directed |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |