PA SR325 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution urging the Governor and the executive branch to develop a plan to implement a solution for the Statewide emergency radio communications system.
Title
Urging the Governor and the executive branch to develop a plan to implement a solution for the Statewide emergency radio communications system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-16 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | Senate | Transmitted as directed |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Adopted |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |