PA SR250 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution directing the Legislative Budget and Finance Committee to conduct a comprehensive study of the current real property tax collection systems in this Commonwealth to determine the impact of the consolidation of those real property tax collection systems, including the costs and benefits associated with consolidation, and to compare them to real property tax collection systems of other states, particularly those states with demographics similar to this Commonwealth.
Title
Directing the Legislative Budget and Finance Committee to conduct a comprehensive study of the current real property tax collection systems in this Commonwealth to determine the impact of the consolidation of those real property tax collection systems, including the costs and benefits associated with consolidation, and to compare them to real property tax collection systems of other states, particularly those states with demographics similar to this Commonwealth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-02 | Transmitted as directed | |
2010-05-25 | Adopted | |
2010-05-03 | Reported as committed | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to FINANCE |