PA SR211 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Passed on September 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-24 - Introduced and adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Passed on September 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-24 - Introduced and adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating September 24, 2019, as the day to commemorate "United States National Health IT Week - September 23, 2019, to September 27, 2019," in Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating September 24, 2019, as the day to commemorate "United States National Health IT Week - September 23, 2019, to September 27, 2019," in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-24 | Senate | Introduced and adopted |