PA SB962 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-14 - Referred to COMMERCE
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-14 - Referred to COMMERCE
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing the Rural Coworking and Innovation Center Grant Program; and providing for requirements and imposing duties on the Department of Community and Economic Development.
Title
Establishing the Rural Coworking and Innovation Center Grant Program; and providing for requirements and imposing duties on the Department of Community and Economic Development.
Sponsors
Sen. Wayne Langerholc [R] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] | Sen. David Argall [R] | Sen. John Gordner [R] |
Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. Judy Schwank [D] | Sen. Jay Costa [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 962 PN 1350, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Adopt Amendment A03427 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Adopt Amendment A03557 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Adopt Amendment A03427 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Adopt Amendment A03557 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |
2022-04-12 | House | In the House |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-01-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |