PA SB96 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Act No. 55 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Act No. 55 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in registration of vehicles, further providing for contributions to Veterans' Trust Fund.
Title
In registration of vehicles, further providing for contributions to Veterans' Trust Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Floor: SB 96 PN 229, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 96 PN 229, Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Floor: SB 96 PN 229, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 96 PN 229, Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | House | Act No. 55 of 2021 |
2021-06-30 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2021-06-23 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2021-06-22 | House | Signed in House |
2021-06-22 | House | Signed in Senate |
2021-06-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2021-06-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-16 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-16 | House | Second consideration |
2021-06-09 | House | Removed from table |
2021-06-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-03-24 | House | Removed from table |
2021-03-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-03-23 | House | First consideration |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-02-26 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-02-24 | House | In the House |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (46-0) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2021-02-03 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |