PA SB919 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 148
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 148
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 28, 1937 (P.L.955, No.265), referred to as the Housing Authorities Law, further providing for powers of an authority; and providing for relocation.
Title
Further providing for powers of an authority; and providing for relocation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: SB 919 PN 1549, FP (Y: 179 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Urban Affairs: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 919 PN 1549, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-18 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Urban Affairs: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 919 PN 1549, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-18 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-24 | House | Act No. 148 |
2018-10-24 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2018-10-18 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2018-10-17 | House | Signed in House |
2018-10-17 | House | Signed in Senate |
2018-10-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (179-2) |
2018-10-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-10-16 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-10-16 | House | Second consideration |
2018-10-15 | House | Removed from table |
2018-06-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-06-19 | House | First consideration |
2018-06-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-03-26 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |
2018-03-21 | House | In the House |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Removed from table |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2017-10-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |