PA SB912 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-05 - Referred to HEALTH
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-05 - Referred to HEALTH
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in public assistance, providing for medical assistance deemed eligibility program for home care, home health and older adult daily living center services.
Title
In public assistance, providing for medical assistance deemed eligibility program for home care, home health and older adult daily living center services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 912 PN 2068, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-05 | House | Referred to HEALTH |
2018-10-03 | House | In the House |
2018-10-03 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2018-10-01 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-10-01 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-09-26 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |