PA SB902 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Act No. 78
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Act No. 78
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of August 9, 1955 (P.L.323, No.130), known as The County Code, in district attorney, assistants and detectives, further providing for filling of vacancies.
Title
In district attorney, assistants and detectives, further providing for filling of vacancies.
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Baker [R] | Sen. Mario Scavello [R] | Sen. Scott Martin [R] | Sen. Doug Mastriano [R] |
Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. Joe Pittman [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - House - House Floor: SB 902 PN 1315, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 902 PN 1315, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - House - House Floor: SB 902 PN 1315, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 902 PN 1315, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-28 | House | Act No. 78 |
2020-09-28 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2020-09-24 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2020-09-23 | House | Signed in House |
2020-09-21 | House | Signed in Senate |
2020-09-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-09-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-05-20 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-05-20 | House | Second consideration |
2020-05-19 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-04 | House | First consideration |
2020-05-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-11-22 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2019-11-20 | House | In the House |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-10-29 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-10-25 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |