PA SB902 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-09-24 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on June 1 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-09-24 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 18, 2001 (P.L.949, No.114), known as the Workforce Development Act, further providing for membership of the Pennsylvania Workforce Investment Board; and establishing the Pennsylvania Center for Health Careers.
Title
An Act amending the act of December 18, 2001 (P.L.949, No.114), known as the Workforce Development Act, further providing for membership of the Pennsylvania Workforce Investment Board; and establishing the Pennsylvania Center for Health Careers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-09-24 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-09-23 | First consideration | |
2008-09-23 | Reported as amended | |
2007-06-01 | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=902 |