PA SB899 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Engrossed on October 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-17 - Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES
Pending: House Aging & Older Adult Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for older adults protective services and imposing penalties; and making a related repeal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for older adults protective services and imposing penalties; and making a related repeal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 899 PN 1906, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-17HouseReferred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES
2018-10-15HouseIn the House
2018-10-15SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-09-25SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-06-22SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-22SenateSecond consideration
2018-06-21SenateFirst consideration
2018-06-21SenateReported as amended
2017-09-26SenateReferred to AGING AND YOUTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=899
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0899&pn=1205
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0899&pn=1906
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=1&theDate=06/21/2018&RollCallId=1027
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=09/25/2018&RollCallId=1100
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=683

Bill Comments

feedback