PA SB898 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in size, weight and load, further providing for restrictions on use of highways and bridges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In size, weight and load, further providing for restrictions on use of highways and bridges.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 898 PN 1452, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-01HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2018-01-31HouseIn the House
2018-01-31SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-01-30SenateAmended on third consideration
2018-01-29SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-01-24SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-01-24SenateSecond consideration
2017-12-13SenateFirst consideration
2017-12-13SenateReported as committed
2017-09-25SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=898
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0898&pn=1200
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0898&pn=1452
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=12/13/2017&RollCallId=594
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=01/29/2018&RollCallId=638
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=404

Bill Comments

feedback