PA SB897 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 145
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 145
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in authorized disposition of offenders, further providing for restitution for injuries to person or property; and, in sentencing, further providing for victim impact statements.
Title
In authorized disposition of offenders, further providing for restitution for injuries to person or property; and, in sentencing, further providing for victim impact statements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 897 PN 2084, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - House - House Floor: SB 897 PN 2084, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A07500 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A10010 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 897 PN 1760, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 897 PN 2084, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - House - House Floor: SB 897 PN 2084, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A07500 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A10010 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 897 PN 1760, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-24 | Senate | Act No. 145 |
2018-10-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2018-10-18 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Signed in House |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (49-0) |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2018-10-16 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2018-10-16 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-10-16 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-0) |
2018-10-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-10-15 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-10-15 | House | Second consideration |
2018-10-11 | House | Removed from table |
2018-10-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-10-09 | House | First consideration |
2018-10-09 | House | Reported as amended |
2018-05-23 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2018-05-22 | House | In the House |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-04-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-09-25 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |