PA SB894 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Act No. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Act No. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a portion of State Route 2005 in Saxonburg Borough, Butler County, as the Chief Gregory B. Adams Way; designating a bridge on that portion of Pennsylvania Rout 271 over US Route 22, Jackson Township, Cambria County, as the Trooper Gary Fisher Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 53 over US Route 22, Cresson Township, Cambria County, as the Corporal Robert J. Sherwood, Jr., Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on Segment 80 of State Route 2015, along Overbridge Street and over Railroad Street, Lilly Borough, Cambria County, as the Paul E. Sweeney Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of Avenue A over the Allegheny River, Coudersport Borough, Potter County, as the Commander Philip F. "Jet" Palmatier, Jr., Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of Sunnyside Road over the Oswayo Creek, Shinglehouse Borough, Potter County, as the PVT Malon Stanley Memorial Bridge; designating a portion of State Route 1001 in Greene Township, Franklin County, as the Lance Corporal Michael L. Freeman, Jr., Memorial Highway; designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 533 over Muddy Run, Southampton Township, Franklin County, as the Private First Class Dana Edward Diehl Memorial Bridge; and designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 1004 over the Conococheague Creek, Greene Township, Franklin County, as the Private Charles W. "Bill" Roher Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a portion of State Route 2005 in Saxonburg Borough, Butler County, as the Chief Gregory B. Adams Way; designating a bridge on that portion of Pennsylvania Rout 271 over US Route 22, Jackson Township, Cambria County, as the Trooper Gary Fisher Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 53 over US Route 22, Cresson Township, Cambria County, as the Corporal Robert J. Sherwood, Jr., Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on Segment 80 of State Route 2015, along Overbridge Street and over Railroad Street, Lilly Borough, Cambria County, as the Paul E. Sweeney Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of Avenue A over the Allegheny River, Coudersport Borough, Potter County, as the Commander Philip F. "Jet" Palmatier, Jr., Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of Sunnyside Road over the Oswayo Creek, Shinglehouse Borough, Potter County, as the PVT Malon Stanley Memorial Bridge; designating a portion of State Route 1001 in Greene Township, Franklin County, as the Lance Corporal Michael L. Freeman, Jr., Memorial Highway; designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 533 over Muddy Run, Southampton Township, Franklin County, as the Private First Class Dana Edward Diehl Memorial Bridge; and designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 1004 over the Conococheague Creek, Greene Township, Franklin County, as the Private Charles W. "Bill" Roher Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 894 PN 1372, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Floor: SB 894 PN 1372, FP (Y: 184 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 894 PN 1294, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Floor: SB 894 PN 1372, FP (Y: 184 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 894 PN 1294, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Act No. 9 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Signed in House |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (49-0) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2018-01-23 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-01-23 | House | Third consideration and final passage (184-0) |
2018-01-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-01-22 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-01-22 | House | Second consideration |
2017-12-12 | House | Removed from table |
2017-12-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-12-11 | House | First consideration |
2017-12-11 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-11-16 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2017-11-14 | House | In the House |
2017-11-14 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2017-11-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-10-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-09-25 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |