PA SB88 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-07-01 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-07-01 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in pupils and attendance, further providing for residence and right to free school privileges.
Title
In pupils and attendance, further providing for residence and right to free school privileges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-30 - Senate - SB 88 PN 590, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-01 | Referred to EDUCATION | |
2009-06-30 | In the House | |
2009-06-30 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-06-24 | Second consideration | |
2009-06-22 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-04-27 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-04-21 | First consideration | |
2009-04-21 | Reported as committed | |
2009-03-05 | Referred to EDUCATION |