PA SB86 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on October 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-25 - Act No. 203
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on October 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-25 - Act No. 203
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for dealing in proceeds of unlawful activities, for the unlawful disposition of motor vehicles and for investigation by police officers; and repealing the Motor Vehicle Chop Shop and Illegally Obtained and Altered Property Act.
Title
Further providing for dealing in proceeds of unlawful activities, for the unlawful disposition of motor vehicles and for investigation by police officers; and repealing the Motor Vehicle Chop Shop and Illegally Obtained and Altered Property Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Browne [R] | Sen. Edwin Erickson [R] | Sen. Stewart Greenleaf [R] | Sen. John Rafferty [R] |
Sen. Christine Tartaglione [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-10-16 - House - SB 86 PN 1680, FP (Y: 195 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - SB 86 PN 1680, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-18 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - SB 86 PN 1680, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-18 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-25 | House | Act No. 203 |
2012-10-25 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2012-10-17 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2012-10-17 | House | Signed in House |
2012-10-16 | House | Signed in Senate |
2012-10-16 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-1) |
2012-10-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-10-15 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-10-15 | House | Second consideration |
2012-10-04 | House | Removed from table |
2012-10-02 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-10-02 | House | First consideration |
2012-10-02 | House | Reported as committed |
2012-03-29 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2012-03-27 | House | In the House |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2012-03-14 | Senate | Second consideration |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2011-11-14 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-10-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-10-18 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2011-01-12 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |