PA SB850 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Introduced on September 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-18 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, providing for community engaged schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for community engaged schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-18SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-10-30SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-10-30SenateSecond consideration
2019-10-29SenateFirst consideration
2019-10-29SenateReported as committed
2019-09-19SenateReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback