PA SB849 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Act No. 44 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Act No. 44 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in veterans' preference, further providing for definitions; and, in voluntary veterans' preference in private employment, further providing for definitions.
Title
In veterans' preference, further providing for definitions; and, in voluntary veterans' preference in private employment, further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 849 PN 1824, Concur in House Amendments (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - House - House Floor: SB 849 PN 1824, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - House - House Floor: SB 849 PN 1807, 2021 A5154 (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - House - House Floor: SB 849 PN 1807, 2021 A5154, SUSP RULES (Y: 197 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Floor: SB 849 PN 1043, 2021 A4988 (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Floor: SB 849 PN 1043, 2021 A4958 (Y: 113 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 849 PN 1043, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - House - House Floor: SB 849 PN 1824, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - House - House Floor: SB 849 PN 1807, 2021 A5154 (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - House - House Floor: SB 849 PN 1807, 2021 A5154, SUSP RULES (Y: 197 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Floor: SB 849 PN 1043, 2021 A4988 (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Floor: SB 849 PN 1043, 2021 A4958 (Y: 113 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 849 PN 1043, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-07 | Senate | Act No. 44 of 2022 |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Signed in House |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (50-0) |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2022-06-27 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-06-27 | House | Final passage (200-0) |
2022-06-27 | House | Third consideration, with amendments (200-0) |
2022-06-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-22 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-22 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2022-06-21 | House | Removed from table |
2022-06-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-15 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-11-09 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2021-11-08 | House | In the House |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-09-21 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |