PA SB847 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Act No. 42
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Act No. 42
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for State Veterans' Commission.
Title
Further providing for State Veterans' Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - House - House Floor: SB 847 PN 1639, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 847 PN 1639, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - House - House Floor: SB 847 PN 1639, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 847 PN 1639, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-13 | House | Act No. 42 |
2016-06-13 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2016-06-07 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2016-06-07 | House | Signed in House |
2016-06-07 | House | Signed in Senate |
2016-06-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (189-0) |
2016-06-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-05-25 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-05-25 | House | Second consideration |
2016-05-24 | House | Removed from table |
2016-05-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-05-23 | House | First consideration |
2016-05-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-04-07 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2016-04-05 | House | In the House |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-03-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |