PA SB843 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on December 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-13 - Act No. 35 of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on December 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-13 - Act No. 35 of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in preliminary provisions, further providing for Special Education Funding Commission, for Basic Education Funding Commission and for Commission on Education and Economic Competitiveness and providing for public job posting database, for instructional vacancy data and for data transparency; providing for Interstate Teacher Mobility Compact; in drug and alcohol recovery high school program, further providing for scope of program and selection of students, providing for enrollment of students and further providing for academic programs; in terms and courses of study, further providing for Economic Education and Personal Financial Literacy Programs; in early learning programs, providing for quarterly reporting; in high schools, further providing for attendance in other districts; in educational tax credits, further providing for definitions; in credit card marketing, further providing for regulation of on-campus credit card marketing; in reimbursements by Commonwealth and between school districts, further providing for assistance to school districts declared to be in financial recovery status or identified for financial watch status; and abrogating regulations.
Title
In preliminary provisions, further providing for Special Education Funding Commission, for Basic Education Funding Commission and for Commission on Education and Economic Competitiveness and providing for public job posting database, for instructional vacancy data and for data transparency; providing for Interstate Teacher Mobility Compact; in drug and alcohol recovery high school program, further providing for scope of program and selection of students, providing for enrollment of students and further providing for academic programs; in terms and courses of study, further providing for Economic Education and Personal Financial Literacy Programs; in early learning programs, providing for quarterly reporting; in high schools, further providing for attendance in other districts; in educational tax credits, further providing for definitions; in credit card marketing, further providing for regulation of on-campus credit card marketing; in reimbursements by Commonwealth and between school districts, further providing for assistance to school districts declared to be in financial recovery status or identified for financial watch status; and abrogating regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 843 PN 1290, Concurrence in House Amendments as Amended (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - House - House Floor: SB 843 PN 1290, CONCURRENCE (Y: 188 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Adopt Amendment A03343 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-15 - House - House Floor: SB 843 PN 1239, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 114 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-14 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A03012 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended A03012 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-14 - House - House Floor: SB 843 PN 963, 2023 A2942 (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-13 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 843 PN 963, Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-09-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - House - House Floor: SB 843 PN 1290, CONCURRENCE (Y: 188 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Adopt Amendment A03343 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-15 - House - House Floor: SB 843 PN 1239, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 114 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-14 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A03012 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended A03012 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-14 - House - House Floor: SB 843 PN 963, 2023 A2942 (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-13 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 843 PN 963, Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-09-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-13 | House | Act No. 35 of 2023 |
2023-12-13 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2023-12-13 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2023-12-13 | House | Signed in House |
2023-12-13 | House | Signed in Senate |
2023-12-13 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments to House amendments (188-15) |
2023-12-13 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2023-12-13 | House | Referred to RULES |
2023-12-13 | House | In the House |
2023-12-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments, as amended by the Senate (45-5) |
2023-12-13 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2023-11-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2023-11-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (114-89) |
2023-11-15 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2023-11-15 | House | Amended in House Committee on APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-11-14 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-11-14 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2023-11-13 | House | Removed from table |
2023-11-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-11-13 | House | First consideration |
2023-11-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-09-21 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |
2023-09-19 | House | In the House |
2023-09-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (46-0) |
2023-09-18 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2023-08-30 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-08-30 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-06-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2023-06-26 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |