PA SB831 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-21 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-21 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 16 (Counties) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, consolidating the act of August 9, 1955 (P.L.323, No.130), known as The County Code; and making a related repeal.
Title
Consolidating the act of August 9, 1955 (P.L.323, No.130), known as The County Code; and making a related repeal.
Sponsors
Sen. Cris Dush [R] | Sen. Scott Hutchinson [R] | Sen. Judith Ward [R] | Sen. Judy Schwank [D] |
Sen. Timothy Kearney [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 831 PN 1760, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Adopt Amendment A04361 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Adopt Amendment A04591 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 831 PN 1760, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Adopt Amendment A04361 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Adopt Amendment A04591 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-21 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-09-20 | House | In the House |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-06-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-08-17 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |