PA SB797 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-20 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-20 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 20, 2000 (P.L.949, No.130), known as the Neighborhood Improvement District Act, further providing for definitions, for creation of neighborhood improvement district and for powers of neighborhood improvement district management association.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for creation of neighborhood improvement district and for powers of neighborhood improvement district management association.
Sponsors
Sen. Devlin Robinson [R] | Sen. David Argall [R] | Sen. Mario Scavello [R] | Sen. John Gordner [R] |
Sen. John Yudichak [R] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. Lisa Boscola [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A04507 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 797 PN 1552, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: A03241: Vote on Amendment Passes A03241 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A04507 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 797 PN 1552, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: A03241: Vote on Amendment Passes A03241 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-20 | House | Removed from table |
2022-09-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-20 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-20 | House | Second consideration |
2022-06-15 | House | Removed from table |
2022-06-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-14 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-14 | House | Reported as amended |
2022-04-07 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |
2022-04-06 | House | In the House |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-12-15 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |