PA SB786 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-25 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Pending: Senate Rules & Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-25 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Pending: Senate Rules & Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in open campus initiatives, further providing for legislative intent, for definitions, for open campus initiatives, for cooperative agreements, for reimbursements by the Commonwealth and for parental and public information.
Title
In open campus initiatives, further providing for legislative intent, for definitions, for open campus initiatives, for cooperative agreements, for reimbursements by the Commonwealth and for parental and public information.
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Aument [R] | Sen. Scott Martin [R] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. Giovanni DiSanto [R] |
Sen. Judith Ward [R] | Sen. Jacob Corman [R] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] | Sen. Michael Regan [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-10-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-25 - House - House Floor: SB 786 PN 2001, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 106 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-24 - House - House Floor: SB 786 PN 1230, 2021 A5605 (Y: 110 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-24 - House - House Floor: SB 786 PN 1230, 2021 A3044 (Y: 88 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-11-15 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A03024 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 786 PN 1108, Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt Amendment A02394 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-25 - House - House Floor: SB 786 PN 2001, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 106 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-24 - House - House Floor: SB 786 PN 1230, 2021 A5605 (Y: 110 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-24 - House - House Floor: SB 786 PN 1230, 2021 A3044 (Y: 88 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-11-15 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A03024 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 786 PN 1108, Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt Amendment A02394 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-25 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2022-10-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-10-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (106-94) |
2022-10-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-10-24 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-10-24 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2022-09-21 | House | Removed from table |
2022-02-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-02-09 | House | Removed from table |
2021-11-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-11-15 | House | First consideration |
2021-11-15 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-10-21 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |
2021-10-19 | House | In the House |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (29-20) |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-09-28 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |