PA SB775 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for museum preservation and for grant program; imposing duties on the Pennsylvania Historical and Museum Commission; establishing the Pennsylvania Museum Preservation Fund; and making an appropriation.
Title
Providing for museum preservation and for grant program; imposing duties on the Pennsylvania Historical and Museum Commission; establishing the Pennsylvania Museum Preservation Fund; and making an appropriation.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Browne [R] | Sen. Jay Costa [D] | Sen. Ryan Aument [R] | Sen. Lisa Baker [R] |
Sen. John Yudichak [R] | Sen. Vincent Hughes [D] | Sen. Thomas Killion [R] | Sen. Lawrence Farnese [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 775 PN 1282, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2018-01-29 | House | In the House |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Removed from table |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2017-10-23 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-06-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |