PA SB751 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Act No. 13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in professional employees, further providing for rating system and for persons to be suspended and providing for a revised rating system; and, in terms and courses of study, providing for pandemic of 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In professional employees, further providing for rating system and for persons to be suspended and providing for a revised rating system; and, in terms and courses of study, providing for pandemic of 2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 751 PN 1599, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-25 - House - House Floor: SB 751 PN 1599, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-24 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A04711 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-24 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A04875 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - House - House Floor: SB 751 PN 1055, 2019 A3816, HARRIS, MOT APPEAL CHAIR (Y: 105 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 751 PN 1055, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-27SenateAct No. 13
2020-03-27SenateApproved by the Governor
2020-03-25SenatePresented to the Governor
2020-03-25SenateSigned in House
2020-03-25SenateSigned in Senate
2020-03-25SenateSenate concurred in House amendments (50-0)
2020-03-25SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2020-03-25SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2020-03-25SenateIn the Senate
2020-03-25HouseThird consideration and final passage (198-0)
2020-03-25HouseRe-reported as amended
2020-03-24HouseAmended in House Committee on APPROPRIATIONS
2019-11-20HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-11-20HouseSecond consideration
2019-11-19HouseRemoved from table
2019-11-18HouseLaid on the table
2019-11-18HouseFirst consideration
2019-11-18HouseReported as committed
2019-06-25HouseReferred to EDUCATION
2019-06-24HouseIn the House
2019-06-24SenateThird consideration and final passage (38-11)
2019-06-24SenateRe-reported as amended
2019-06-19SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-19SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-18SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-18SenateReported as amended
2019-06-13SenateReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=751
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0751&pn=0970
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0751&pn=1007
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0751&pn=1055
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0751&pn=1599
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=23&theDate=06/18/2019&RollCallId=323
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=173
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/24/2019&RollCallId=411
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=11/18/2019&RollCallId=1341
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=882
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1138
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=413
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=03/25/2020&RollCallId=759
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/24/2020&RollCallId=1746
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/24/2020&RollCallId=1745
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/24/2020&RollCallId=1744

Bill Comments

feedback