PA SB75 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-10)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Act No. 105
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-10)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Act No. 105
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, extensively revising the law on human trafficking in the areas of prosecution, prevention, victim protection, evidentiary confidentiality, limitation of actions, victim impact statements and classification of sexual offenses; and making editorial changes.
Title
Extensively revising the law on human trafficking in the areas of prosecution, prevention, victim protection, evidentiary confidentiality, limitation of actions, victim impact statements and classification of sexual offenses; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-29 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-10 - Senate - SB 75 PN 1626, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-09 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-10 - Senate - SB 75 PN 1626, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-09 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | Senate | Act No. 105 |
2014-07-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (50-0) |
2014-06-29 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2014-06-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-06-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (203-0) |
2014-06-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-24 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-24 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2014-06-17 | House | Removed from table |
2014-06-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-06-10 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-10 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-12-12 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2013-12-10 | House | In the House |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2013-12-09 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2013-12-04 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-12-03 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2013-11-20 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-11-18 | Senate | Removed from table |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2013-01-29 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |