PA SB738 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in the Secretary of the Commonwealth, further providing for explanation of ballot question.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In the Secretary of the Commonwealth, further providing for explanation of ballot question.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 738 PN 867, Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-28HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2021-09-27HouseIn the House
2021-09-27SenateThird consideration and final passage (43-6)
2021-09-27SenateRe-reported as committed
2021-06-23SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-06-23SenateSecond consideration
2021-06-22SenateFirst consideration
2021-06-22SenateReported as committed
2021-06-07SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback