PA SB721 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-12 - Referred to HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 10:00 am in Room 515 Irvis Office
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 9:30 am in Room 140 Main Capitol
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-12 - Referred to HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 10:00 am in Room 515 Irvis Office
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 9:30 am in Room 140 Main Capitol
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing the Women, Infants and Children State Advisory Board.
Title
Establishing the Women, Infants and Children State Advisory Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 721 PN 1147, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-03 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Adopt Amendment A02270 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-03 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 721 PN 1147, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-03 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Adopt Amendment A02270 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-03 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-12 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |
2023-12-12 | House | In the House |
2023-12-12 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2023-12-12 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2023-11-13 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-11-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-10-03 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-10-03 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |