PA SB674 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-11)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-30 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-30 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in high schools, further providing for academic degrees.
Title
In high schools, further providing for academic degrees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-29 - Senate - SB 674 PN 737, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-30 | Referred to EDUCATION | |
2009-04-29 | In the House | |
2009-04-29 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-04-22 | Second consideration | |
2009-04-21 | First consideration | |
2009-04-21 | Reported as committed | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to EDUCATION |