PA SB652 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-9)
Status: Engrossed on July 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-16 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-16 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 31, 1965 (P.L.1257, No.511), known as The Local Tax Enabling Act, in consolidated collection of local income taxes, further providing for definitions.
Title
In consolidated collection of local income taxes, further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 652 PN 691, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-16 | House | Referred to FINANCE |
2015-07-14 | House | In the House |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (46-0) |
2015-07-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-03 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |