PA SB648 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 13 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 74
Status: Enrolled on December 13 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 74
Summary
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Department of Military and Veterans Affairs and the Governor, to grant and convey, at a price to be determined through a competitive bid process, certain lands, buildings and improvements situate in the Borough of Ligonier, Westmoreland County; authorizing and directing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor and the Department of Military and Veterans Affairs, to grant and convey certain lands situate in the City of Connellsville, a third class city, Fayette County, to the City of Connellsville; authorizing and directing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to the Allentown Commercial and Industrial Development Authority, or their assigns, certain lands situate in the City of Allentown, Lehigh County, Pennsylvania; and authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to Bensalem Township, certain lands situate in Bensalem Township, Bucks County; and authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to the Pennsylvania State Employees Credit Union, certain lands situate in Susquehanna Township, Dauphin County.
Title
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Department of Military and Veterans Affairs and the Governor, to grant and convey, at a price to be determined through a competitive bid process, certain lands, buildings and improvements situate in the Borough of Ligonier, Westmoreland County; authorizing and directing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor and the Department of Military and Veterans Affairs, to grant and convey certain lands situate in the City of Connellsville, a third class city, Fayette County, to the City of Connellsville; authorizing and directing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to the Allentown Commercial and Industrial Development Authority, or their assigns, certain lands situate in the City of Allentown, Lehigh County, Pennsylvania; and authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to Bensalem Township, certain lands situate in Bensalem Township, Bucks County; and authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to the Pennsylvania State Employees Credit Union, certain lands situate in Susquehanna Township, Dauphin County.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-12-18 | Approved by the Governor | |
2007-12-13 | Presented to the Governor | |
2007-12-13 | Signed in House | |
2007-12-12 | Signed in Senate | |
2007-12-12 | Senate concurred in House amendments | |
2007-12-12 | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed | |
2007-10-30 | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS | |
2007-10-29 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-10-23 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2007-10-17 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-10-16 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-09-27 | Removed from table | |
2007-09-27 | Laid on the table | |
2007-07-07 | Removed from table | |
2007-07-06 | Laid on the table | |
2007-07-06 | First consideration | |
2007-07-06 | Reported as amended | |
2007-06-20 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT | |
2007-06-20 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-06-19 | Amended on third consideration | |
2007-06-13 | Second consideration | |
2007-06-12 | First consideration | |
2007-06-12 | Reported as committed | |
2007-03-22 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=648 |