PA SB640 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-28 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-28 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of October 27, 1955 (P.L.744, No.222), known as the Pennsylvania Human Relations Act, further providing for findings and declaration of policy and for right to freedom from discrimination in employment, housing and public accommodation; and providing for therapy dogs and public transportation and unlawful discriminatory practices.
Title
Further providing for findings and declaration of policy and for right to freedom from discrimination in employment, housing and public accommodation; and providing for therapy dogs and public transportation and unlawful discriminatory practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-28 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Removed from table |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2015-06-02 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |