PA SB637 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, in health and accident insurance, providing for pharmaceutical pricing transparency.
Title
In health and accident insurance, providing for pharmaceutical pricing transparency.
Sponsors
Sen. Donald White [R] | Sen. Sharif Street [D] | Sen. Camera Bartolotta [R] | Sen. Jay Costa [D] |
Sen. Wayne Fontana [D] | Sen. James Brewster [D] | Sen. Daniel Laughlin [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-12-13 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-12-13 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |