PA SB624 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-22 - Act No. 32
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-22 - Act No. 32
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 27, 1966 (1st Sp.Sess., P.L.31, No.1), known as The Bituminous Mine Subsidence and Land Conservation Act, providing for planned subsidence and for retroactivity.
Title
Providing for planned subsidence and for retroactivity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 624 PN 1000, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-09 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Floor: SB 624 PN 1000, FP (Y: 120 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Floor: SB 624 PN 1000, MOT CONST, VITALI (Y: 136 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Floor: SB 624 PN 697, 2017 A1311, VITALI (Y: 44 N: 148 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-06-21 - House - House Floor: SB 624 PN 697, 2017 A2182, CARROLL (Y: 168 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 624 PN 697, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-09 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Floor: SB 624 PN 1000, FP (Y: 120 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Floor: SB 624 PN 1000, MOT CONST, VITALI (Y: 136 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Floor: SB 624 PN 697, 2017 A1311, VITALI (Y: 44 N: 148 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-06-21 - House - House Floor: SB 624 PN 697, 2017 A2182, CARROLL (Y: 168 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 624 PN 697, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-22 | Senate | Act No. 32 |
2017-07-22 | Senate | Became Law without Governor's signature |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2017-07-10 | Senate | Signed in House |
2017-07-10 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2017-07-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (28-21) |
2017-07-09 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2017-06-26 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-06-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (120-77) |
2017-06-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-21 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-21 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2017-06-20 | House | Removed from table |
2017-06-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-06-19 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-06-07 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2017-06-06 | House | In the House |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (32-17) |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-05-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |