PA SB623 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Act No. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Act No. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in hunting and furtaking licenses, further providing for license requirements and for unlawful acts concerning licenses.
Title
In hunting and furtaking licenses, further providing for license requirements and for unlawful acts concerning licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-30 - Senate - SB 623 PN 951, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - SB 623 PN 951, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - SB 623 PN 599, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - SB 623 PN 951, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - SB 623 PN 599, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | Senate | Act No. 7 |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Signed in House |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (49-0) |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2013-04-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-04-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2013-04-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-04-23 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-04-23 | House | Second consideration |
2013-04-22 | House | Removed from table |
2013-04-17 | House | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 951 |
2013-04-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-04-16 | House | First consideration |
2013-04-16 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-03-21 | House | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |
2013-03-19 | House | In the House |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-03-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |