PA SB621 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 67
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 67
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, amending provisions relating to school police officers, school resource officers and school security guards; and imposing powers and duties on the Pennsylvania Commission on Crime and Delinquency.
Title
Amending provisions relating to school police officers, school resource officers and school security guards; and imposing powers and duties on the Pennsylvania Commission on Crime and Delinquency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - House - House Floor: SB 621 PN 1081, FP (Y: 116 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 621 PN 1081, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A02543 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Floor: SB 621 PN 1009, 2019 A2211, D. MILLER (Y: 86 N: 105 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-06-20 - House - House Floor: SB 621 PN 1009, 2019 A2210, D. MILLER (Y: 93 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-06-20 - House - House Floor: SB 621 PN 1009, 2019 A2209, D. MILLER (Y: 90 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-06-18 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A02170 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 621 PN 931, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 621 PN 866, A1766, HAYWOOD AMENDMENT NO. A-1766 (Y: 22 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 621 PN 866, A1733, WILLIAMS, LINDSEY AMENDMENT NO. A-1733 (Y: 22 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 621 PN 727, A1620, REGAN AMENDMENT NO. A-1620-RECONSIDERED (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 621 PN 727, A1620, REGAN AMENDMENT NO. A-1620 (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 621 PN 1081, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A02543 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Floor: SB 621 PN 1009, 2019 A2211, D. MILLER (Y: 86 N: 105 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-06-20 - House - House Floor: SB 621 PN 1009, 2019 A2210, D. MILLER (Y: 93 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-06-20 - House - House Floor: SB 621 PN 1009, 2019 A2209, D. MILLER (Y: 90 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-06-18 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A02170 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 621 PN 931, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 621 PN 866, A1766, HAYWOOD AMENDMENT NO. A-1766 (Y: 22 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 621 PN 866, A1733, WILLIAMS, LINDSEY AMENDMENT NO. A-1733 (Y: 22 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 621 PN 727, A1620, REGAN AMENDMENT NO. A-1620-RECONSIDERED (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 621 PN 727, A1620, REGAN AMENDMENT NO. A-1620 (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | Senate | Act No. 67 |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Signed in House |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (30-20) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2019-06-27 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-27 | House | Third consideration and final passage (116-83) |
2019-06-27 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2019-06-26 | House | Amended in House Committee on APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-20 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-20 | House | Second consideration |
2019-06-19 | House | Removed from table |
2019-06-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-18 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-18 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-06-12 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |
2019-06-11 | House | In the House |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (32-17) |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Amended on second consideration (28-20) |
2019-05-07 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |