PA SB620 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Act No. 36
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Act No. 36
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the release of Project 70 restrictions on certain land owned by the Borough of Carlisle, Cumberland County, in return for the development of park and open-space lands within North Middleton Township, Cumberland County.
Title
Authorizing the release of Project 70 restrictions on certain land owned by the Borough of Carlisle, Cumberland County, in return for the development of park and open-space lands within North Middleton Township, Cumberland County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 620 PN 1130, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-27 - House - House Floor: SB 620 PN 1130, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-27 - House - House Floor: SB 620 PN 1130, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, CUTLER (Y: 173 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Floor: SB 620 PN 617, 2015 A2479, BLOOM (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 620 PN 617, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 620 PN 1130, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-27 - House - House Floor: SB 620 PN 1130, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-27 - House - House Floor: SB 620 PN 1130, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, CUTLER (Y: 173 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Floor: SB 620 PN 617, 2015 A2479, BLOOM (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 620 PN 617, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-10 | Senate | Act No. 36 |
2015-07-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Signed in House |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (49-0) |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2015-06-28 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2015-06-27 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-06-27 | House | Third consideration and final passage (189-0) |
2015-06-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-26 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-26 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-06-25 | House | Removed from table |
2015-06-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-06-23 | House | First consideration |
2015-06-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-06-12 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2015-06-10 | House | In the House |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-06-02 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |