PA SB620 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-20 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-20 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 20 (Decedents, Estates and Fiduciaries) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in powers of attorney, further providing for general provisions and for special rules for gifts; providing for agent's duties and for principles of law and equity; further providing for form of power of attorney, for implementation of power of attorney and for liability; providing for liability for refusal to accept power of attorney and for activities through employees; and further providing for validity.
Title
In powers of attorney, further providing for general provisions and for special rules for gifts; providing for agent's duties and for principles of law and equity; further providing for form of power of attorney, for implementation of power of attorney and for liability; providing for liability for refusal to accept power of attorney and for activities through employees; and further providing for validity.
Sponsors
Sen. Stewart Greenleaf [R] | Sen. Richard Alloway [R] | Sen. Judy Schwank [D] | Sen. Wayne Fontana [D] |
Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. Vincent Hughes [D] | Sen. Patrick Browne [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-18 - Senate - SB 620 PN 627, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2013-03-18 | House | In the House |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-03-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |