PA SB613 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-20 - Bill, together with Governor's Veto Message, laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in administrative organization, repealing provisions relating to employees with access to Federal tax information and reenacting provisions relating to criminal history background checks of employees and contractors with access to Federal tax information; and providing for COVID-19 emergency mitigation plan for businesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In administrative organization, repealing provisions relating to employees with access to Federal tax information and reenacting provisions relating to criminal history background checks of employees and contractors with access to Federal tax information; and providing for COVID-19 emergency mitigation plan for businesses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-15 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 613 PN 1636, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - House Floor: SB 613 PN 1636, FP (Y: 107 N: 95 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - House Floor: SB 613 PN 1629, 2019 A4997, SUSP RULES, BRADFORD (Y: 92 N: 110 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-04-14 - House - House Floor: SB 613 PN 1629, 2019 A4993, SUSP RULES, BRADFORD (Y: 92 N: 110 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-04-14 - House - House Floor: SB 613 PN 1629, 2019 A5000, SUSP RULES, HARRIS (Y: 92 N: 110 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-04-14 - House - House Floor: SB 613 PN 1629, 2019 A5070, CUTLER (Y: 108 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-07 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A04941 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 613 PN 679, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-20HouseBill, together with Governor's Veto Message, laid on the table
2020-04-20HouseIn the Senate
2020-04-20SenateVeto No. 3
2020-04-20SenateVetoed by the Governor
2020-04-16SenatePresented to the Governor
2020-04-16SenateSigned in House
2020-04-15SenateSigned in Senate
2020-04-15SenateSenate concurred in House amendments (29-21)
2020-04-15SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2020-04-15SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2020-04-14SenateIn the Senate
2020-04-14HouseFinal passage (107-95)
2020-04-14HouseThird consideration, with amendments
2020-04-07HouseRe-reported as amended
2019-06-11HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-11HouseSecond consideration
2019-06-10HouseRemoved from table
2019-06-05HouseLaid on the table
2019-06-05HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-05HouseReported as committed
2019-05-08HouseReferred to FINANCE
2019-05-07HouseIn the House
2019-05-07SenateThird consideration and final passage (47-0)
2019-05-06SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-05-06SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-05-06SenateSecond consideration
2019-05-01SenateFirst consideration
2019-05-01SenateReported as committed
2019-04-30SenateReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=613
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0613&pn=0679
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0613&pn=1629
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0613&pn=1636
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=25&theDate=05/01/2019&RollCallId=140
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=05/06/2019&RollCallId=151
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=73
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=06/05/2019&RollCallId=634
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/07/2020&RollCallId=1772
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/07/2020&RollCallId=1771
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1152
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1153
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1154
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1155
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1156
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=420
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=04/15/2020&RollCallId=785

Bill Comments

feedback