PA SB612 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-12 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in professional employees, further providing for causes for suspension and for persons to be suspended.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In professional employees, further providing for causes for suspension and for persons to be suspended.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-11 - Senate - SB 612 PN 1209, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - SB 612 PN 1188, A2144, PICCOLA AMENDMENT NO. A-2144 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - SB 612 PN 1135, PICCOLA AMENDMENT A-1990, PAGE 2 LINES 2 THROUGH 4 (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - SB 612 PN 1135, PICCOLA AMENDMENT A-1990 (RECONSIDERED), EXCLUDING PAGE 2 LINES 2 THROUGH 4 (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - SB 612 PN 1135, PICCOLA AMENDMENT A-1990, EXCLUDING PAGE 2 LINES 2 THROUGH 4 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - SB 612 PN 1135, A2037, BLAKE AMENDMENT NO. A-2037 (Y: 23 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-12-12HouseLaid on the table
2011-11-22HouseRemoved from table
2011-11-22HouseLaid on the table
2011-10-05HouseRemoved from table
2011-10-05HouseLaid on the table
2011-06-21HouseRemoved from table
2011-06-20HouseLaid on the table
2011-06-20HouseFirst consideration
2011-06-20HouseReported as amended
2011-05-11HouseReferred to EDUCATION
2011-05-11HouseIn the House
2011-05-11SenateThird consideration and final passage (38-12)
2011-05-10SenateAmended on third consideration
2011-05-09SenateAmended on third consideration
2011-05-04SenateSecond consideration
2011-05-02SenateRe-reported as amended
2011-04-13SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2011-04-05SenateFirst consideration
2011-04-05SenateReported as amended
2011-02-18SenateReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2011&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=612
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0612&pn=0615
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0612&pn=0974
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0612&pn=1135
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0612&pn=1188
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0612&pn=1209
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0612&pn=1386
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=88
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=92
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=102
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2011&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=23&theDate=04/05/2011&rNbr=98
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2011&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=05/02/2011&rNbr=193
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=85
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=86
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=87

Bill Comments

feedback