PA SB607 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-11-21 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in rules of the road in general, further providing for speed timing devices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In rules of the road in general, further providing for speed timing devices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-18 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03858 (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 607 PN 675, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-21HouseRemoved from table
2019-11-18HouseLaid on the table
2019-11-18HouseFirst consideration
2019-11-18HouseReported as amended
2019-06-26HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2019-06-25HouseIn the House
2019-06-25SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-1)
2019-06-24SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-06-18SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-18SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-12SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-12SenateReported as committed
2019-04-30SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=607
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0607&pn=0675
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0607&pn=1384
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=06/12/2019&RollCallId=297
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/24/2019&RollCallId=405
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=185
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=11/18/2019&RollCallId=1412
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=11/18/2019&RollCallId=1413

Bill Comments

feedback