PA SB6 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Enrolled on October 18 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-10-18 - Presented to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in public assistance, further providing for definitions, for resources and for verification system, prohibiting eligibility for individuals convicted of drug distribution, prohibiting eligibility for violators of sexual offender registration, further providing for false statements, investigations and penalty and for prohibited use of public assistance funds, providing for lost access devices and further providing for violation and penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In public assistance, further providing for definitions, for resources and for verification system, prohibiting eligibility for individuals convicted of drug distribution, prohibiting eligibility for violators of sexual offender registration, further providing for false statements, investigations and penalty and for prohibited use of public assistance funds, providing for lost access devices and further providing for violation and penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 6 PN 2105, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: SB 6 PN 2105, FP (Y: 124 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - House - House Floor: SB 6 PN 1085, 2017 A10382, BRIGGS (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 6 PN 1085, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-18SenatePresented to the Governor
2018-10-17SenateSigned in House
2018-10-17SenateSigned in Senate
2018-10-17SenateSenate concurred in House amendments (37-12)
2018-10-17SenateIn the Senate
2018-10-17HouseThird consideration and final passage (124-62)
2018-10-17HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-10-16HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-10-16HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-10-02HouseRemoved from table
2018-09-25HouseLaid on the table
2018-09-25HouseFirst consideration
2018-09-25HouseReported as committed
2017-07-11HouseReferred to HEALTH
2017-07-10HouseIn the House
2017-07-10SenateThird consideration and final passage (40-9)
2017-07-09SenateAmended on third consideration
2017-07-08SenateRe-reported as committed
2017-06-26SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-26SenateSecond consideration
2017-06-21SenateFirst consideration
2017-06-21SenateReported as amended
2017-01-25SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=6
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0006&pn=0164
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0006&pn=0994
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0006&pn=1085
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0006&pn=2105
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=06/21/2017&RollCallId=328
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=07/08/2017&RollCallId=413
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=245
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=09/25/2018&RollCallId=1952
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1569
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/17/2018&RollCallId=2076
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1607
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=759

Bill Comments

feedback